VA SB315 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0489)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0489)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voting equipment; locking and sealing of voting and counting machines after election. Provides that if a voting or counting machine secured by removal of a data storage device containing the only record of votes cast for any office or on any question and the machine itself does not contain such a record, that machine is required to remain locked and sealed only until it is returned to the site at which voting and counting machines are stored in the locality. The sealed envelopes containing the equipment keys for such machines are required to be delivered to the electoral board no later than noon on the day following the election. The bill also provides that the requirements for locking and sealing voting equipment do not apply to any ballot marking device and its data storage device provided to meet accessibility requirements, where the number of persons voting in the election or the number of votes cast for any office or on any question are not recorded by the ballot marking device. All other voting systems are subject to current provisions for the locking and sealing of equipment.
Title
Voting equipment; locking and sealing of voting and counting machines after election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0489) | |
2016-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 489 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB315ER) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-03 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (93-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2016-03-01 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-29 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-26 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101528D |
Same As/Similar To
HB104 (Same As) 2016-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0218)