VA SB313 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Stricken from Senate calendar (38-Y 2-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Stricken from Senate calendar (38-Y 2-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Retail sale of cannabis products by certain pharmaceutical processors and industrial hemp processors; sunset. Allows certain pharmaceutical processors and industrial hemp processors to sell, under the oversight of the Board of Directors of the Virginia Cannabis Control Authority (the Board), cannabis products at retail to unregistered persons who are 21 years of age or older without the need for a written certification. The bill directs the Board to adopt and enforce regulations governing such sales that shall model certain Board of Pharmacy regulations and comply with other requirements set forth in the bill. The bill requires pharmaceutical processors and industrial hemp processors engaging in such sales to pay a $1 million fee and collect a 21 percent excise tax, both of which shall ultimately be allocated to the Virginia Cannabis Control Authority to be used to assist independent cannabis retailers located in designated rural and urban opportunity zones. The bill also requires such pharmaceutical processors and industrial hemp processors to submit and comply with a plan describing how the processor will educate consumers about responsible consumption of cannabis products and incubate independent cannabis retailers or support and educate persons that wish to participate in the cannabis market. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2023, and shall expire when pharmaceutical processors and industrial hemp processors engaging in the sale of cannabis products pursuant to the provisions of the bill are authorized by the Virginia Cannabis Control Authority to apply for and be granted licenses to cultivate, manufacture, wholesale, and sell at retail to consumers 21 years of age or older retail marijuana and retail marijuana products. Retail sale of cannabis products by certain pharmaceutical processors and industrial hemp processors; sunset. Allows certain pharmaceutical processors and industrial hemp processors to sell, under the oversight of the Board of Directors of the Virginia Cannabis Control Authority (the Board), cannabis products at retail to unregistered persons who are 21 years of age or older without the need for a written certification. The bill directs the Board to adopt and enforce regulations governing such sales that shall model certain Board of Pharmacy regulations and comply with other requirements set forth in the bill. The bill requires pharmaceutical processors and industrial hemp processors engaging in such sales to pay a $1 million fee and collect a 21 percent excise tax, both of which shall ultimately be allocated to the Virginia Cannabis Control Authority to be used to assist independent cannabis retailers located in designated rural and urban opportunity zones. The bill also requires such pharmaceutical processors and industrial hemp processors to submit and comply with a plan describing how the processor will educate consumers about responsible consumption of cannabis products and incubate independent cannabis retailers or support and educate persons that wish to participate in the cannabis market. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2023, and shall expire when pharmaceutical processors and industrial hemp processors engaging in the sale of cannabis products pursuant to the provisions of the bill are authorized by the Virginia Cannabis Control Authority to apply for and be granted licenses to cultivate, manufacture, wholesale, and sell at retail to consumers 21 years of age or older retail marijuana and retail marijuana products.
Title
Cannabis products; retail sale by certain pharmaceutical processors & industrial hemp processors.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Stricken from Senate calendar (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Morrissey agreed to (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 3-N 2-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Morrissey agreed to (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 3-N 2-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | Stricken from Senate calendar (38-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Passed by for the day (21-Y 19-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Morrissey agreed to |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Title replaced 22106562D-S2 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Morrissey agreed to (21-Y 18-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 22105965D-S1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 22106563D-S3 (Ebbin) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 22106562D-S2 (Morrissey) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 3-N 2-A) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Incorporates SB621 (Dunnavant) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105965D-S1 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (8-Y 7-N) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: Cannabis |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104291D |