VA SB311 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Real property; duty to disclose ownership interest and lis pendens. Provides that a real estate licensee has an affirmative duty, upon having substantive discussions about specific real property, to disclose in writing to the purchaser, seller, lessor, or lessee of the property if he, any member of his family, his firm, any member of his firm, or any entity in which he has an ownership interest has or will have an ownership interest as a party to the transaction and must also disclose in writing that he is a licensee. The bill requires that an owner of a residential dwelling unit who has actual knowledge of a lis pendens filed against the dwelling unit must provide to a prospective purchaser a written disclosure of such fact on a form provided by the Real Estate Board on its website.
Title
Real property; duty to disclose ownership interest and lis pendens.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Motion to reconsider vote to pass in enrolled form agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Motion to reconsider vote to pass in enrolled form agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Requires 2/3 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (22-Y 18-N) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote to pass in enrolled form agreed to (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (24-Y 16-N) |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB311ER) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB311S1 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22104860D-S1 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22104860D-S1 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103554D |
Same As/Similar To
HB281 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610)
HB281 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610)
HB281 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 4616 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2138.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 706.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |