VA HB281 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property; duty to disclose ownership interest and lis pendens. Provides that a real estate licensee has an affirmative duty, upon having substantive discussions about specific real property, to disclose in writing to the purchaser, seller, lessor, or lessee of the property if he, any member of his family, his firm, any member of his firm, or any entity in which he has an ownership interest has or will have an ownership interest as a party to the transaction and must also disclose in writing that he is a licensee. The bill requires that an owner of a residential dwelling unit who has actual knowledge of a lis pendens filed against the dwelling unit must provide to a prospective purchaser a written disclosure of such fact on a form provided by the Real Estate Board on its website.
Title
Real property; duty to disclose ownership interest and lis pendens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 610 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB281ER) |
2022-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-09 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB281H1 |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105033D-H1 |
2022-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105033D-H1 |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104086D |
Same As/Similar To
SB311 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
SB311 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
SB311 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 4616 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2138.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 706.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |