VA SB308 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vacancies in constitutional offices; special elections. Allows the governing body of a county or city in which a vacancy in a constitutional office has occurred to request in its petition for a writ of election that the circuit court order the special election to be held at the next ensuing general election and allows the court to issue such writ. The bill also authorizes the governing body to petition the circuit court to request that no special election be ordered when the vacancy occurs within the 12 months immediately preceding the end of the term of that office and requires the court to grant such a request. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Vacancies in constitutional offices; petition to circuit court to request no special elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511) | |
2016-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 511 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB308ER) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB308ER) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-03 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (93-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2016-03-01 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2016-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-29 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-26 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 16103711D-E |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB308E |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103711D |
Same As/Similar To
HB832 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0453)