VA SB306 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0234)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0234)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; sales by brewery on licensed premises. Requires that when a brewery licensee sells at retail the brands of beer that the brewery owns, at least 20 percent of the volume of beer sold for on-premises consumption in any calendar year shall be manufactured on the licensed premises. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2019, with a further delayed effective date of April 30, 2022, for a brewery that has entered into (i) a performance agreement with the Commonwealth of Virginia Development Opportunity Fund on or about April 20, 2016; (ii) a performance agreement entitled "Regarding Operation Period Economic Development Grant" on or about April 20, 2016; and (iii) a commercial lease agreement on or about April 14, 2017. This bill is identical to HB 422.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; sales by brewery on licensed premises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0234) | |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 234 (effective 1/1/19 - see bill) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB306ER) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-22 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2018-02-20 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18101340D-E |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB306E |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101340D |