VA SB306 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0347)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0347)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Information provided to political parties and candidates. Provides that, upon request and at a reasonable charge not to exceed the actual cost incurred, a political party or candidate is entitled to receive a copy of (i) the list of officers of election showing their party designation and assigned precinct and (ii) any instructions or information provided by the State Board to local electoral boards and registrars. The Board is required to post on the Internet its rules and regulations within three business days of their adoption.
Title
Political parties and candidates; copies of instructions or information provided by State Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0347) | |
2010-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 347 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB306ER) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2010-03-02 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-03-02 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-01 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-26 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (20-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-19 | House: Assigned P & E sub: #3 Campaign Finance | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB306S1 | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104372D-S1 | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104372D-S1 | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100897D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |