VA SB304 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - Stricken at request of Patron in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - Stricken at request of Patron in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; energy storage capacity requirements; certain facilities. Provides that if Appalachian Power and Dominion Energy Virginia newly acquire the right to energy storage capacity from energy storage facilities located in the Commonwealth that were in operation on January 1, 2021, such energy storage capacity will, to the extent the utility has not already contracted for access to the newly acquired energy storage facility, count toward the utility's energy storage capacity requirements.
Title
Electric utilities; energy storage capacity requirements, certain facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Stricken at request of Patron in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Stricken at request of Patron in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Energy |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101458D |