VA SB299 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Board for Asbestos, Lead, and Home Inspectors; asbestos contractors; notice to asbestos workers. Requires employers to provide each licensed asbestos worker with a written notice containing the following information: (i) a statement that the worker has the right to work in a safe environment, (ii) a summary of basic safety rules for handling asbestos, and (iii) information on how to file a complaint with the Board for Asbestos, Lead, and Home Inspectors. In addition, the bill empowers the Board to summarily suspend the license of an asbestos contractor if the Board finds that the asbestos contractor's conduct poses a substantial danger to the public health or safety and authorizes the Board to suspend, revoke, or deny renewal of an existing license of any asbestos contractor who is shown to have a substantial identity of interest with an asbestos contractor whose license has been revoked or not renewed.
Title
Asbestos, Lead, & Home Inspectors, Board for; examination, asbestos worker license applicants.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Left in General Laws |
2014-02-27 | House | Continued to 2015 in General Laws by voice vote |
2014-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 14101959D-E |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB299E |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (12-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101959D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 515.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 516.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 516.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |