VA SB282 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 530 (effective 7/1/20)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Ignition interlock for first offense driving under the influence of drugs. Provides that a court of proper jurisdiction may, as a condition of a restricted license, prohibit an offender from operating a motor vehicle that is not equipped with a functioning, certified ignition interlock system for a first offense of driving under the influence of drugs. Under current law, such prohibition is required to be ordered as a condition of a restricted license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ignition interlock; first offense driving under the influence of drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 38-N) (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 530 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-10 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-10SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 10, 2020
2020-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-27SenateSigned by President
2020-02-27SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB282ER)
2020-02-27SenateEnrolled
2020-02-24HouseVOTE: Passage (61-Y 38-N)
2020-02-24HousePassed House (61-Y 38-N)
2020-02-24HouseRead third time
2020-02-21HouseRead second time
2020-02-19HouseReported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 5-N)
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateReported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2020-01-03SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-03SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100608D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182270.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback