VA SB277 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Income tax deduction for commuter benefits provided by an employer. Establishes, for taxable years 2021 through 2025, an individual and corporate income tax deduction for commuter benefits, defined in the bill, provided by an employer to its employees. The deduction is available only to the employer and is limited to $265 per employee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax, state and corporate; deduction for commuter benefits provided by an employer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Bill not properly before the Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 46-N) (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB277ER)
2020-03-18SenateEnrolled
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (27-Y 13-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Adoption (55-Y 44-N)
2020-03-05HouseConference report agreed to by House (55-Y 44-N)
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-02-27HouseDelegates: Watts, Keam, Campbell, J.L.
2020-02-27HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-02-27SenateSenators: Barker, Marsden, Ebbin
2020-02-27SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-02-26SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26SenateBill not properly before the Senate (24-Y 16-N)
2020-02-26HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-02-26HouseHouse insisted on amendments
2020-02-26SenateHouse amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Passage (52-Y 46-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House with amendments (52-Y 46-N)
2020-02-26HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2020-02-26HouseCommittee on Appropriations amendments agreed to
2020-02-26HouseCommittee on Finance amendment agreed to
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-26HousePassed by temporarily
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseReported from Appropriations with amendments (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-19HouseReported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 4-N)
2020-02-13HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2020-02-12HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-02-12HouseRead first time
2020-02-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N)
2020-02-04SenatePrinted as engrossed 20103304D-E
2020-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB277E
2020-02-04SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-04SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-04SenateRead second time
2020-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (12-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Finance to Finance and Appropriations due to a change of the committee name
2020-01-03SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-03SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103304D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581322.03(n/a)See Bill Text
581402(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB277&201+sum+SB277
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB277+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB277E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB277ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0113+SB0277
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0288SB0277+SB0277
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0338SB0277+SB0277
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1001V0046+SB0277
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H10V0325+SB0277
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H10V0344+SB0277
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0380+SB0277
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1470+SB0277
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1100SB0277+SB0277
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1127SB0277+SB0277
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1130SB0277+SB0277
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1963+SB0277
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1766SB0277+SB0277

Bill Comments

feedback