VA SB277 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0250)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0250)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF); applications. Allows TANF applicants to retain pre-existing support they may have received on their own behalf or on behalf of any other family member.
Title
Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF); allows applicants to retain pre-existing support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0250) | |
2010-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 250 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB277ER) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-01 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-26 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-25 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-19 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #2 | |
2010-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103211D |