VA SB273 | 2022 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB273
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; absentee voting; verification by social security number or unique identifier in lieu of witness signature. Requires the State Board of Elections to promulgate regulations for providing a unique identifier to any qualified voter who lacks a social security number and provides that such unique identifier can be accepted in place of a social security number for the purposes of voting absentee. The bill makes optional the current absentee ballot witness signature requirement by giving the voter the option to provide the last four digits of the voter's social security number and the voter's date of birth in lieu of a witness signature. The bill clarifies that verification of the required voter affirmation on absentee ballots by the general registrar includes matching any date of birth and last four digits of the social security number or assigned unique identifier provided as part of the voter affirmation against the information in the voter's registration record. Elections; absentee voting; verification by social security number or unique identifier in lieu of witness signature. Requires the State Board of Elections to promulgate regulations for providing a unique identifier to any qualified voter who lacks a social security number and provides that such unique identifier can be accepted in place of a social security number for the purposes of voting absentee. The bill makes optional the current absentee ballot witness signature requirement by giving the voter the option to provide the last four digits of the voter's social security number and the voter's date of birth in lieu of a witness signature. The bill clarifies that verification of the required voter affirmation on absentee ballots by the general registrar includes matching any date of birth and last four digits of the social security number or assigned unique identifier provided as part of the voter affirmation against the information in the voter's registration record.
Title
Absentee voting; verification by social security number or unique identifier.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. Amanda Chase [R] | Sen. Jennifer Kiggans [R] | Sen. Mark Peake [R] |
Sen. David Suetterlein [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 46-N) (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 46-N) (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | Senate | Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455 |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Bloxom, Ransone, Glass |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Ebbin, Boysko, Vogel |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | House requested conference committee |
2022-03-10 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2022-03-10 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (17-Y 23-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Passage (53-Y 46-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed House with substitute (53-Y 46-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB273H1 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22107233D-H1 |
2022-03-09 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 22107233D-H1 |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (17-Y 5-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB273S1 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105199D-S1 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105199D-S1 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100443D |
Same As/Similar To
SB273 (Carry Over) 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 702.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |