VA SB273 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0791)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0791)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Assessments for affordable housing units. Provides that assessments for certain affordable housing units be done according to the income approach, based on the property's current use and restrictions. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Housing Commission.
Title
Affordable housing units; assessments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0791) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 791 (effective 1/1/11) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB273ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 1-N) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-12 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB273ER) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2010-03-03 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-03-03 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-02 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-01 | House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #1 | |
2010-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB273S1 | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104625D-S1 | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104625D-S1 | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 1-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103164D |