VA SB272 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
General Assembly; consideration of certain documents related to the budget bill or general appropriation act. Provides that no legislative action may be taken on (i) any committee amendment to the budget bill or general appropriation act, (ii) any conference committee report on the budget bill or general appropriation act, or (iii) any Governor's recommendation on the budget bill or general appropriation act until each such amendment, report, recommendation, or budget bill has been posted on the General Assembly's website for at least 72 hours. The bill provides that each house may vote by two-thirds majority to override the posting requirement.
Title
General Assembly; consideration of certain documents related to budget bill.
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Finance (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-30 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Continued to 2013 in Finance (13-Y 2-N) |
2012-02-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2012-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Rules (14-Y 1-N) |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100373D |