VA SB27 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Tabled in Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Tabled in Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Public School Trades Incentive Fund and Program; established. Establishes the Public School Trades Incentive Fund (the Fund) and the Public School Trades Incentive Program (the Program) for the purpose of providing grants on a competitive basis from the Fund to any school board that seeks to (i) restore high school programs that teach students skilled trades that lead to earning industry-recognized certifications or credentials or (ii) create or restore middle school programs that encourage and recruit students to participate in high school programs that teach students skilled trades that lead to earning industry-recognized certifications or credentials. The bill requires the Department of Education to administer the Program and to establish such rules and procedures relating to applications and awards as it deems appropriate, provided that the Department considers and gives appropriate weight to certain criteria for grantees. The bill requires any grantee to use Program funds only for equipment.
Title
Public School Trades Incentive Fund and Program; created and established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - House - House: Tabled in Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | Tabled in Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB27S1 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24106504D-S1 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106504D-S1 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101813D |