VA SB263 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Concealed handgun permits; demonstration of competence. Removes the option for concealed handgun permit applicants to demonstrate competence with a handgun by completing an electronic, video, or online course conducted by a state-certified or National Rifle Association-certified firearms instructor. The bill does not affect any in-person means of satisfying the requirement to demonstrate competence with a handgun under current law. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concealed handgun permits; demonstration of competence, effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (52-Y 42-N) (Y: 52 N: 41 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB263ER)
2020-03-18SenateEnrolled
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 17-N)
2020-03-04HouseVOTE: Agree To (52-Y 42-N)
2020-03-04HouseConference report agreed to by House (52-Y 42-N)
2020-03-04 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-02-27HouseDelegates: Lopez, Hope, Wright
2020-02-27HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-02-26SenateSenators: Bell, Deeds, Stuart
2020-02-26SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-02-26SenateSenate acceded to request (36-Y 3-N)
2020-02-24HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-02-24HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2020-02-21SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
2020-02-19HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N)
2020-02-19HousePassed House with substitute (54-Y 46-N)
2020-02-19HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB263H1
2020-02-19HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108289D-H1
2020-02-19HouseRead third time
2020-02-18HouseRead second time
2020-02-14HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108289D-H1
2020-02-14HouseReported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-02-03HouseRead first time
2020-02-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2020-01-29SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-01-28SenatePrinted as engrossed 20102385D-E
2020-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB263E
2020-01-28SenateAmendment by Senator Deeds agreed to
2020-01-28SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-01-28SenateRead second time
2020-01-27SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-22SenateReported from Judiciary (7-Y 6-N)
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2020-01-03SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-03SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102385D

Same As/Similar To

HB264 (Same As) 2020-03-23 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 390 (effective 1/1/21)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.02(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.06(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB263&201+sum+SB263
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB263+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB263E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB263H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB263ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0075+SB0263
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0149SB0263+SB0263
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0231SB0263+SB0263
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H15V0092+SB0263
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1022+SB0263
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0796SB0263+SB0263
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1027SB0263+SB0263
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1770+SB0263
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1765SB0263+SB0263

Bill Comments

feedback