VA HB264 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 390 (effective 1/1/21)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Concealed handgun permits; demonstration of competence. Removes the option for concealed handgun permit applicants to demonstrate competence with a handgun by completing an electronic, video, or online course conducted by a state-certified or National Rifle Association-certified firearms instructor. The bill does not affect any in-person means of satisfying the requirement to demonstrate competence with a handgun under current law. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concealed handgun permits; demonstration of competence, effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 45-N) (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 390 (effective 1/1/21)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB264ER)
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled
2020-02-28HouseVOTE: Adoption (52-Y 45-N)
2020-02-28HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 20108960D-S1 (52-Y 45-N)
2020-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-26SenatePassed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N)
2020-02-26SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB264S1
2020-02-26SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108960D-S1
2020-02-26SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-26SenateRead third time
2020-02-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108960D-S1
2020-02-24SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 46-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB264H1
2020-02-10HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107665D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107665D-H1
2020-02-07HouseReported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-04HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
2020-01-20HouseAssigned PS sub: Firearms
2019-12-30HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2019-12-30HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101680D

Same As/Similar To

SB263 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.02(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.06(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB264&201+sum+HB264
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB264+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB264H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB264S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB264ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1501V0023+HB0264
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H15V0042+HB0264
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0872+HB0264
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0418+HB0264
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0986HB0264+HB0264
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1041HB0264+HB0264
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1603+HB0264

Bill Comments

feedback