VA SB259 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0317)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0317)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Human trafficking; information for public schools. Requires the Board of Education, with assistance from the Department of Social Services, to provide awareness and training materials for local school division staff on human trafficking, including strategies for the prevention of trafficking of children.
Title
Human trafficking; Board of Education to provide information for local school division staff.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0317) | |
2012-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 317 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB259ER) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2012-02-22 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-20 | House: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Assigned Education sub: Teachers and Admin. Action | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12101870D-E | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB259E | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-13 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Public Education | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101870D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1188 (Same As) 2012-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0370)