VA SB240 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0888)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Firearms; removal from persons posing substantial risk; penalties. Creates a procedure by which any attorney for the Commonwealth or law-enforcement officer may apply to a general district court, circuit court, or juvenile and domestic relations district court judge or magistrate for an emergency substantial risk order to prohibit a person who poses a substantial risk of injury to himself or others from purchasing, possessing, or transporting a firearm. Upon service of an emergency substantial risk order, the person who is subject to the order shall be given the opportunity to voluntarily relinquish any firearm. An emergency substantial risk order shall expire on the fourteenth day following issuance of the order. The bill requires a court hearing in the circuit court for the jurisdiction where the order was issued within 14 days from issuance of an emergency substantial risk order to determine whether a substantial risk order should be issued. Seized firearms shall be retained by a law-enforcement agency for the duration of an emergency substantial risk order or a substantial risk order or, for a substantial risk order and with court approval, may be transferred to a third party 21 years of age or older chosen by the person from whom they were seized. The bill allows the complainant of the original warrant to file a motion for a hearing to extend the substantial risk order prior to its expiration. The court may extend the substantial risk order for a period not longer than 180 days. The bill provides that persons who are subject to a substantial risk order, until such order has been dissolved by a court, are guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor for purchasing, possessing, or transporting a firearm; are disqualified from having a concealed handgun permit; and may not be employed by a licensed firearms dealer. The bill also provides that a person who transfers a firearm to a person he knows has been served with a warrant or who is the subject of a substantial risk order is guilty of a Class 4 felony. The bill creates a computerized substantial risk order registry for the entry of orders issued pursuant to provisions in the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; removal from persons posing substantial risk of injury to himself, etc., penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 47-N) (Y: 53 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Surovell 20105922D-S3 agreed to (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Pending question ordered (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional readings dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0888)
2020-04-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 888 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-07SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB240ER)
2020-03-05SenateEnrolled
2020-02-28SenateTitle replaced 20108809D-H1
2020-02-28SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Passage (53-Y 47-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House with substitute (53-Y 47-N)
2020-02-26HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB240H1
2020-02-26HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108809D-H1
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108809D-H1
2020-02-21HouseReported from Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 8-N)
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-22SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2020-01-21SenatePrinted as engrossed 20105922D-ES3
2020-01-21SenateTitle replaced 20105922D-S3
2020-01-21SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute with amendments SB240ES3
2020-01-21SenateAmendment by Senator Surovell agreed to
2020-01-21SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-01-21SenateAmendment #3 by Senator Norment agreed to
2020-01-21SenateAmendment #2 by Senator Norment ruled out of order
2020-01-21SenateAmendment #1 by Senator Norment ruled out of order
2020-01-21SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-01-21SenateSubstitute by Senator Surovell 20105922D-S3 agreed to (21-Y 19-N)
2020-01-21SenatePending question ordered (27-Y 13-N)
2020-01-21SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-21SenateSubstitute by Senator Morrisey withdrawn 20105857D-S2
2020-01-21SenateCommittee substitute rejected 20105669D-S1
2020-01-21SenateRead second time
2020-01-20SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-17SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-16SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-16SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-01-16SenateFloor substitute printed 20105922D-S3 (Surovell)
2020-01-15SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-15SenateFloor substitute printed 20105857D-S2 (Morrissey)
2020-01-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-13SenateCommittee substitute printed 20105669D-S1
2020-01-13SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N)
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2020-01-02SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-02SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103425D

Same As/Similar To

HB674 (Same As) 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0887)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.09(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.1:6(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:1(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:2(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:3(n/a)See Bill Text
192152.13(n/a)See Bill Text
192152.17(n/a)See Bill Text
192387.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB240&201+sum+SB240
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB240+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB240S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB240S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB240S3+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB240ES3+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB240H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB240ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0888+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0011+SB0240
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0035SB0240+SB0240
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0103SB0240+SB0240
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0104SB0240+SB0240
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0117SB0240+SB0240
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H15V0103+SB0240
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1504+SB0240
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1229SB0240+SB0240

Bill Comments

feedback