VA SB223 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0638)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0638)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Intercollegiate athletics; student-athletes; compensation and representation for name, image, or likeness. Establishes several parameters for the compensation and representation of a student-athlete related to the use of such student's name, image, or likeness. The bill prohibits any private institution of higher education, associate-degree-granting public institution of higher education, or baccalaureate public institution of higher education or any agent thereof; athletic association; athletic conference; or other organization with authority over intercollegiate athletics from (i) prohibiting or preventing a student-athlete from earning compensation for the use of his name, image, or likeness, except in certain circumstances enumerated in the bill; (ii) prohibiting or preventing a student-athlete from obtaining professional representation by a licensed athlete agent or legal representation by a licensed attorney in connection with issues related to name, image, or likeness; (iii) declaring a student-athlete ineligible for intercollegiate athletic competition because he earns such compensation or obtains such representation; or (iv) reducing, canceling, revoking, or not renewing an athletic scholarship because a student-athlete earns such compensation or obtains such representation. The bill establishes several other conditions and limitations relating to pre-agreement disclosures, the use of the institution's property, and the effect on employment status in connection with a student-athlete's use of his name, image, or likeness. The bill also amends the definition of "athlete agent" in relevant law to permit such agents to represent a student-athlete in connection with issues related to name, image, or likeness, including negotiating, securing, obtaining, arranging, and managing name, image, or likeness opportunities.
Title
Intercollegiate athletics; student-athletes, compensation and representation for name, image, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 4-N) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 4-N) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0638) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 638 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB223ER) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Title replaced 22107199D-H1 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (96-Y 4-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House with substitute (96-Y 4-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB223H1 |
2022-03-02 | House | Substitute by Delegate Austin agreed to 22107199D-H1 |
2022-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-01 | House | Floor substitute printed 22107199D-H1 (Austin) |
2022-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103714D |
Same As/Similar To
HB507 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0510)
HB507 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0510)
HB507 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0510)
Subjects
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Professions and Occupations
Professions and Occupations