VA SB220 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-24 - Incorporated by Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-24 - Incorporated by Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Office of the Attorney General; employment of outside counsel where a conflict of interests exists. Requires the Attorney General's office to enter into an agreement with outside counsel to provide legal services in a matter when the Attorney General certifies to the Governor that it would be improper for his office to do so because a conflict of interests exists. For criminal matters, outside counsel shall be an Attorney for the Commonwealth and for civil matters, outside counsel shall be a county or city attorney. The compensation for the legal services provided shall be expended from funds appropriated to the Attorney General's office and paid directly to the local jurisdiction.
Title
Attorney General, Office of; employment of outside counsel where a conflict of interests exists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Rules (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-24 | Senate | Incorporated by Rules |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Rules |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2014-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101224D |
Same As/Similar To
SB651 (Similar To) 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824)