VA SB22 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - Senate: Continued to 2011 in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - Senate: Continued to 2011 in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Assault and battery; fire marshals; penalty. Adds fire marshals and assistant fire marshals who have police powers to the definition of law-enforcement officer in the assault and battery criminal provision, which means that the punishment for committing an assault and battery on such a person who is engaged in the performance of his public duties is elevated from a Class 1 misdemeanor to a Class 6 felony, with a six-month mandatory minimum term of confinement.
Title
Assault and battery; penalty when against fire marshals and assistant fire marshals.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2011 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | Senate: Continued to 2011 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (12-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2009-12-23 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2009-12-23 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100985D |