VA SB219 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (12-Y 8-N)
Hearing: Feb 21 in House Room 3
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Voter registration; automatic voter registration. Provides for the automatic electronic transmission by the Department of Motor Vehicles to the Department of Elections of certain information for any person coming into an office of the Department of Motor Vehicles or accessing its website in order to (i) apply for, replace, or renew a driver's license; (ii) apply for, replace, or renew a special identification card; or (iii) change an address on an existing driver's license or special identification card if the person indicates that he is a United States citizen and is 17 years of age or older and, at the time of the transaction, does not decline to have his information transmitted to the Department of Elections for voter registration purposes. The option to decline to have his information so transmitted shall be presented at the time of one of the specified transactions with the Department of Motor Vehicles and shall be accompanied by a warning that intentionally making a materially false statement during the transaction is punishable under Virginia law as a felony. Upon receipt of the information collected to ensure that the person meets all voter registration eligibility requirements, the Department of Elections is required to determine whether the person is already registered to vote. If the person is not already registered to vote, the Department of Elections is required to transmit the information to the appropriate general registrar. The bill repeals the requirement that the Department of Motor Vehicles offer, accept, receive, and send voter registration applications. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter registration; automatic voter registration, effective clause.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (12-Y 8-N)
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-02-18HouseRead first time
2020-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB219S2
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106190D-S2
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute rejected 20107035D-S1
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106190D-S2
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 1-N)
2020-01-28SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107035D-S1
2020-01-28SenateIncorporates SB278 (Barker)
2020-01-28SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
2019-12-30SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-12-30SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100923D

Same As/Similar To

SB278 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242410.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242411.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242411.3(n/a)See Bill Text
242412(n/a)See Bill Text
242413(n/a)See Bill Text
242415.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242418(n/a)See Bill Text
242653(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback