VA SB217 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0501)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0501)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Business Ready Expedited Permitting Program established; report. Establishes the Virginia Business Ready Expedited Permitting Program and directs the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority to designate up to two sites and four projects for participation in the Program. Sites and projects eligible for the Program shall include only (i) sites eligible for a site development grant under the Virginia Business Ready Sites Program or (ii) projects with significant local, regional, or statewide economic impact that the governing body of the locality in which the project is located has either (a) approved following a public meeting or hearing or (b) submitted, by resolution, for consideration to be included in the Program. No more than two eligible sites or projects shall be designated as part of the Program within any locality annually. The Authority shall complete a review process within 45 days of designating a site to reduce permitting conflicts and provide relevant guidance to applicants. The bill also provides that no project shall be considered eligible to enter the Program after December 31, 2027, and requires annual reporting from the Authority. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2025, and expires on June 30, 2028.
Title
Virginia Business Ready Expedited Permitting Program; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (91-Y 6-N) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (91-Y 6-N) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0501) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 501 (effective 1/1/25) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB217ER) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2024-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (91-Y 6-N) |
2024-03-07 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (91-Y 6-N) |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2024-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2024-03-04 | House | Delegates: Carr, Thomas, Campbell |
2024-03-04 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senators: Locke, Aird, Pillion |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | House requested conference committee |
2024-02-28 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2024-02-27 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | VOTE: Passage (93-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Passed House with substitute (93-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB217H1 |
2024-02-23 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107930D-H1 |
2024-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107930D-H1 |
2024-02-20 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB217S2 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24107627D-S2 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 24105568D-S1 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107627D-S2 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24105568D-S1 |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103411D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1125 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0471)