VA SB215 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0687)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0687)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia College Savings Plan; incorporated government agency. Declares the Virginia College Savings Plan to be a body politic and corporate. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Virginia College Savings Plan; Plan established as a body politic and corporate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0687) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 687 (effective 4/6/14) | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB215ER) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-19 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 14101783D-E |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB215E |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Emergency clause added |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101783D |
Same As/Similar To
HB203 (Same As) 2014-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0023)