VA SB209 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0070)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0070)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Adoption; award of damages; death by wrongful act. Provides that, in a case for death by wrongful act, the child of a decedent who has been adopted after the death of such decedent shall be included in the class of beneficiaries entitled to an award of damages resulting from such case, provided that a court had not previously terminated the parental rights of such decedent.
Title
Adoption; award of damages, death by wrongful act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0070) | |
2024-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 70 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB209ER) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-23 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Moved from Judiciary to Courts of Justice due to a change of the committee name |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100004D |
Same As/Similar To
HB140 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0069)