VA SB207 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0095)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0095)
Summary
Foreign and alien insurers; exemption for insuring industrial insureds. Revises the criteria for qualifying as an industrial insured. Certain acts involving insurance contracts issued to an industrial insured are excluded from the acts that constitute transacting the business of insurance in the Commonwealth. The revisions to the criteria (i) allow the insured to procure insurance by using a licensed insurance consultant, (ii) increase the required amount of annual insurance premiums from $25,000 to $100,000, and (iii) require the insured to have either gross assets in excess of $3 million or annual gross revenues in excess of $5 million. Other revisions specify that the insured risks do not include life or annuity contracts and that the aggregate annual premiums do not include premiums from life, annuity, and accident and sickness insurance.
Title
Foreign and alien insurers; exemption for insuring industrial insureds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0095) | |
2008-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 95 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-20 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB207ER) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-19 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Passed House (94-Y 3-N) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-18 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-14 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (19-Y 2-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080078864 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB207 |