VA SB206 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0478)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0478)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative Process Act; ex parte communications. Provides that, during the period that a hearing is pending, a hearing officer is prohibited from communicating with any person concerning the hearing without notice and opportunity for all parties to participate in the communication. The bill also provides that a hearing officer may communicate about a pending hearing in instances where the communication is authorized by law, involves a ministerial matter, or does not augment, diminish, or modify the evidence in the record. In addition, the bill establishes the procedures to be followed if a hearing officer makes or receives a prohibited communication and the relief that a hearing officer may provide in such instances. As introduced, the bill is the recommendation of the Administrative Law Advisory Committee and approved by the Virginia Code Commission.
Title
Administrative Process Act; ex parte communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0478) | |
2016-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 478 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB206ER) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-29 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2016-02-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-23 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100686D |