VA SB20 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-24 - Incorporated by Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-24 - Incorporated by Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Secretary of the Commonwealth; lobbyist disclosure. Redesigns the Lobbyist's Disclosure Statement to clarify information requested and increase compliance. Among other things, the redesigned form (i) requires a lobbyist to include a list of all House of Delegates or Senate bills and procurement transactions for which he has lobbied, as well as the expenses related to such lobbying activity, and (ii) changes the manner in which entertainment and gift expenses are reported. The bill requires the Secretary of the Commonwealth to review each Lobbyist's Disclosure Statement for completeness and accuracy and, if the statement is not properly completed, reject the entire filing and return it to the lobbyist. The bill clarifies that any lobbyist who files the statement electronically is not required to submit a paper copy and extends from 10 days to 30 days the late-filing grace period after which the lobbyist is assessed an additional $50 per day civil penalty.
Title
Lobbyist's Disclosure Statement; redesigns to clarify information requested and increase compliance.
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-24 | Senate | Incorporated by Rules |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Rules |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) |
2013-12-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-12-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100775D |
Same As/Similar To
SB649 (Similar To) 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0804)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 426 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 428 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 431 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |