VA SB2 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Delegates: Herring, Heretick, Collins
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Marijuana; decriminalization of simple marijuana possession; penalty. Decriminalizes simple marijuana possession and provides a civil penalty of no more than $50, or 5 hours of community service as an alternative punishment. Current law imposes a maximum fine of $500 and a maximum 30-day jail sentence for a first offense, and subsequent offenses are a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill provides that the suspended sentence and substance abuse screening provisions and driver's license suspension provisions apply only to criminal violations. The bill also provides that simple possession of marijuana may constitute conduct that presents a serious threat to the well-being of a child for the purposes of defining a "child in need of services." The bill defines marijuana to include hashish oil. The bill raises the threshold amount of marijuana subject to the offense of distribution or possession with intent to distribute from one-half ounce to one ounce. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marijuana; decriminalization of simple possession, civil penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 38-N) (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (63-Y 35-N) (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseDelegates: Herring, Heretick, Collins
2020-02-27HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-02-27SenateSenators: Ebbin, Morrissey, Stanley
2020-02-27SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-02-26SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-02-26HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2020-02-26SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 38-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Passage (63-Y 35-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House with substitute (63-Y 35-N)
2020-02-26HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB2H2
2020-02-26HouseCommittee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 20108848D-H2
2020-02-26HouseCommittee on Courts of Justice substitute rejected 20108640D-H1
2020-02-26HousePassed by temporarily
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108848D-H2
2020-02-21HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
2020-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-19HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108640D-H1
2020-02-19HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 8-N)
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (27-Y 13-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePrinted as engrossed 20106511D-ES1
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB2ES1
2020-02-11SenateAmendment by Senator Ebbin agreed to
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-11SenateAmendment by Senator Surovell rejected
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106511D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N)
2020-01-29SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106511D-S1
2020-01-29SenateIncorporates SB815 (Morrissey)
2020-01-29SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 3-N)
2020-01-16SenateAssigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2019-11-18SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2019-11-18SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100705D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161228(n/a)See Bill Text
161260(n/a)See Bill Text
161273(n/a)See Bill Text
182247(n/a)See Bill Text
182248.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182250.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182251(n/a)See Bill Text
182251.02(n/a)See Bill Text
182252(n/a)See Bill Text
182254(n/a)See Bill Text
182259.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.4(n/a)See Bill Text
462390.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5413401(n/a)See Bill Text
5413446(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB2
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB2S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB2ES1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB2H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB2H2+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0106+SB0002
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0269+SB0002
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0002+SB0002
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0528SB0002+SB0002
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0530SB0002+SB0002
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H08V0339+SB0002
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0377+SB0002
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1472+SB0002
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1098SB0002+SB0002
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1126SB0002+SB0002

Bill Comments

feedback