VA HB972 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Possession and consumption of marijuana; penalty. Decriminalizes simple marijuana possession and provides a civil penalty of no more than $25. Current law imposes a maximum fine of $500 and a maximum 30-day jail sentence for a first offense, and subsequent offenses are a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill provides that any violation of simple possession of marijuana may be charged by a summons in form the same as the uniform summons for motor vehicle law violations and that no court costs shall be assessed for such violations. The bill also provides that a person's criminal history record information shall not include records of any charges or judgments for such violations and records of such charges or judgements shall not be reported to the Central Criminal Records Exchange. Additionally, the bill provides that the suspended sentence/substance abuse screening provisions and driver's license suspension provisions apply only to criminal violations or to civil violations by a juvenile. The bill defines "marijuana" to include hashish oil and creates a rebuttable presumption that a person who possesses no more than one-half ounce of marijuana possesses it for personal use. The bill also (i) makes records relating to the arrest, criminal charge, or conviction of possession of marijuana not open to public inspection and disclosure, except in certain circumstances; (ii) prohibits employers and educational institutions from requiring an applicant for employment or admission to disclose information related to such arrest, criminal charge, or conviction; and (iii) prohibits agencies, officials, and employees of the state and local governments from requiring an applicant for a license, permit, registration, or governmental service to disclose information concerning such arrest, criminal charge, or conviction. Finally, the bill requires the Secretaries of Agriculture and Forestry, Finance, Health and Human Resources, and Public Safety and Homeland Security to convene a work group to study the impact on the Commonwealth of legalizing the sale and personal use of marijuana and report the recommendations of the work group to the General Assembly and the Governor by November 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marijuana; possession and consumption, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Passage (64-Y 34-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House (64-Y 34-N)
2020-02-07HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB972H1
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107729D-H1
2020-02-07HouseRead second time
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 8-N)
2020-02-05HouseIncorporates HB301 (Levine)
2020-02-05HouseIncorporates HB481 (Kory)
2020-02-05HouseIncorporates HB265 (Heretick)
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107729D-H1
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103384D

Same As/Similar To

HB265 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
HB301 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
HB481 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161228(n/a)See Bill Text
161260(n/a)See Bill Text
161273(n/a)See Bill Text
182248.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182250.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182250.2(n/a)See Bill Text
182251(n/a)See Bill Text
182251.02(n/a)See Bill Text
182251.03(n/a)See Bill Text
182252(n/a)See Bill Text
182254(n/a)See Bill Text
182259.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.09(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.1:5(n/a)See Bill Text
192188.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192389.3(n/a)See Bill Text
462390.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback