VA SB198 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Disposable plastic shopping bags; local option. Allows any locality by ordinance to prohibit the distribution, sale, or offer for sale of disposable plastic shopping bags to consumers. The bill exempts from any such prohibition reusable bags of a certain thickness, bags that are used to carry certain products, such as ice cream or newspapers, and garbage bags that are sold in multiples.
Title
Disposable plastic shopping bags; local option.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-12-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101662D |
Same As/Similar To
SB11 (Similar To) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1023)