VA SB195 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Incorporated by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Incorporated by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; statute of limitations on actions on construction contracts; statute of limitations on actions on performance bonds. Provides that no action may be brought by a public body on any construction contract, including construction management and design-build contracts, unless such action is brought within five years after completion of the work on the project, and provides that no action may be brought by a public body on a warranty or guaranty in such construction contract more than one year from the breach of that warranty, but in no event more than one year after the expiration of such warranty or guaranty. The bill also limits the time frame during which a public body, other than the Department of Transportation, may bring an action against a surety on a performance bond to within one year after completion of the work on the project. Current law allows a public body, other than the Department of Transportation, to bring such an action within one year after (i) completion of the contract, including the expiration of all warranties and guaranties, or (ii) discovery of the defect or breach of warranty that gave rise to the action. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; statute of limitations on actions on construction contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Judiciary (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Incorporated by Judiciary |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-12-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102791D |
Same As/Similar To
SB607 (Similar To) 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0497)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 4340 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4340.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4343 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 212.2:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |