VA SB192 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0144)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0144)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Fisheries; nonresident harvester's license. Prohibits the Marine Resources Commission from selling a commercial fishing license to a nonresident whose state of residence does not offer for sale the same or comparable license to a resident of the Commonwealth. This bill is similar to
Title
Harvester's license; prohibits Marine Resources Commission from issuing certain nonresident license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0144) | |
2010-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 144 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-01 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB192ER) | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-19 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-19 | House: Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-19 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2010-02-19 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-02-19 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-18 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-21 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10101209D-E | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB192E | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101209D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1291 (Same As) 2010-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012)