VA SB191 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0457)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0457)
Summary
Local vehicle licenses. Allows localities to exempt from local vehicle license fees vehicles owned by members and former members of authorized police volunteer citizen support units.
Title
Vehicle license fees, local; localities to exempt those owned by citizen support units.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0457) | |
2008-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 457 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-02 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-28 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB191ER) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | House: Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2008-02-25 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-25 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-22 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-21 | House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: 2 | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087081240 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB191 |