VA SB188 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; application by electronic mail or other electronic means. Provides that the State Board of Elections shall implement a system to accept absentee ballot applications electronically. Currently, an applicant may request and receive, but not submit, an absentee ballot application electronically. The bill further provides that any applicant for an absentee ballot may request that the ballot materials be sent to him by electronic transmission. The option for such electronic transmission is currently available only to military and overseas voters.
Title
Absentee voting; application for absentee ballots by electronic mail or other electronic means.
Sponsors
Sen. John Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in Privileges and Elections | |
2012-02-21 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-02-17 | House: Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB188S1 | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104369D-S1 | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104369D-S1 | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-17 | Senate: Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101645D |