VA SB186 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0170)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0170)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; individualized education program teams; guidelines. Requires the Department of Education to establish guidelines for individualized education program (IEP) teams to utilize when developing IEPs for children with disabilities to ensure that IEP teams consider the need for age-appropriate and developmentally appropriate instruction related to sexual health, self-restraint, self-protection, respect for personal privacy, and personal boundaries of others. The bill requires each local school board, in developing IEPs for children with disabilities, in addition to any other requirements established by the Board of Education, to ensure that IEP teams consider such guidelines.
Title
Individualized education program teams; Department of Education to develop guidelines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0170) | |
2020-03-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 170 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 6, 2020 | |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 28, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB186ER) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-20 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-17 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20101446D-E |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB186E |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Dunnavant agreed to |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-12-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-12-27 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101446D |
Same As/Similar To
HB134 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0051)