VA SB181 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Suspension of driver's license for nonpayment of fines or costs. Repeals the requirement that the driver's license of a person convicted of any violation of the law who fails or refuses to provide for immediate payment of fines or costs be suspended. The bill provides that the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles shall return or reinstate any person's driver's license that was suspended prior to July 1, 2018, solely for nonpayment of fines or costs, provided that such person has paid the applicable reinstatement fee. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act. This bill incorporates SB 148.
Title
Driver's license; suspension for nonpayment of fines or costs.
Sponsors
Sen. William Stanley [R] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Sen. Monty Mason [D] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Sen. Scott Surovell [D] | Sen. Jennifer Wexton [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-03-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote |
2018-03-01 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18105986D-ES1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB181ES1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Stanley agreed to |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18105986D-S1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendments (13-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Incorporates SB148 (Edwards) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18105986D-S1 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101254D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 258.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 354 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 354.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1200.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 361 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 391.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 395 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 819.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 819.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 819.3:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 819.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |