VA SB181 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0269)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0269)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Augmented estate; elective share of surviving spouse. Revises provisions of the Code related to the elective share of the surviving spouse of a decedent dying on or after January 1, 2017, to track revisions made to the Uniform Probate Code by the Uniform Law Commission. The bill calculates the elective share of the surviving spouse as a graduated percentage, taking into account both spouses' assets and the length of marriage. Under current law, the surviving spouse is awarded 50% of the estate if there were no children and 33.3% if there were children. The bill also clarifies the process by which the elective share is to be claimed and provides instructions for the valuation of assets to encourage uniformity in the method of calculation of the elective share.
Title
Augmented estate; elective share of surviving spouse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0269) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 269 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016 | |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/16 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB181ER) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-24 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2016-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101823D |
Same As/Similar To
HB231 (Same As) 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0187)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 2 | 1805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 2022 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 308.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 308.17 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 317 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 556 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 632 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |