VA SB180 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0129)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0129)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Acceptability of electronic medium; record of criminal proceedings to appellate court. Provides that in a criminal proceeding in circuit court any statutory requirement for an original, original paper, paper, record, document, facsimile, memorandum, exhibit, certification, or transcript shall be satisfied if such item is in an electronic form approved for filing under the Rules of Supreme Court of Virginia. The bill also provides that in a criminal proceeding any statutory authorization for the use of copies or reproductions shall be satisfied by use of such copies or reproductions in hard copy or electronic form approved for filing under the Rules of Supreme Court of Virginia. Under current law, only in civil proceedings are such statutory requirements and authorizations satisfied by an approved electronic form of such items. This bill is a recommendation of the Judicial Council. This bill is identical to HB 235.
Title
Acceptability of electronic medium; record of criminal proceedings to appellate court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0129) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 129 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB180ER) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101383D |