VA SB178 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-13 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 120 (effective 1/1/09)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-13 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 120 (effective 1/1/09)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Pass-through entities; penalties. Revises the failure to file an information return and the failure to remit withholding tax penalties on pass-through entities. These provisions apply to taxable years beginning on and after January 1, 2009.
Title
Pass-through entities; penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 120 (effective 1/1/09) | |
2010-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0120) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-01 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB178ER) | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-02-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-23 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-22 | House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2010-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10103744D-E | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB178E | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103744D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 486.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 486.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |