VA SB172 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0746)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Student-athletes; concussion policies. Requires each non-interscholastic youth sports program utilizing public school property to (i) establish policies and procedures regarding the identification and handling of suspected concussions in student-athletes, consistent with either the local school division's policies and procedures or the Board's Guidelines for Policies on Concussions in Student-Athletes, or (ii) follow the local school division's policies and procedures regarding the identification and handling of suspected concussions in student-athletes. The bill also adds information on the effects of concussions on academic performance to the Board's Guidelines for Policies on Concussions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student-athletes; effects of concussions on academic performance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 96 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-07 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0746)
2014-04-07 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 746 (effective 7/1/14)
2014-03-03SenateSigned by President
2014-03-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2014-02-28SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB172ER)
2014-02-28SenateEnrolled
2014-02-26SenateTitle replaced 14105103D-H1
2014-02-26SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2014-02-24HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N)
2014-02-24HousePassed House with substitute (95-Y 4-N)
2014-02-24HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB172H1
2014-02-24HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 14105103D-H1
2014-02-24HouseRead third time
2014-02-21HousePassed by for the day
2014-02-20HouseRead second time
2014-02-19HouseCommittee substitute printed 14105103D-H1
2014-02-19HouseReported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2014-02-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
2014-02-07HouseAssigned Education sub: Education Reform
2014-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2014-01-24HouseRead first time
2014-01-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2014-01-21SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2014-01-20SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB172S1
2014-01-20SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 14103639D-S1
2014-01-20SenateReading of substitute waived
2014-01-20SenateRead second time
2014-01-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2014-01-16SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2014-01-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 14103639D-S1
2014-01-08SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2014-01-02SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2014-01-02SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101793D

Same As/Similar To

HB410 (Same As) 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0760)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221271.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+SB172
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+SB172+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+SB172S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+SB172H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+SB172ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+CHAP0746+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+S04V0040+SB0172
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+SV0073SB0172+SB0172
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+SV0103SB0172+SB0172
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+H0903V0049+SB0172
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+H09V0165+SB0172
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+HV0973+SB0172
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+SV0559SB0172+SB0172

Bill Comments

feedback