VA SB1703 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Library of Virginia; disposition of official correspondence of the Governor. Requires the Library of Virginia to catalogue and make accessible to the public all correspondence and other records required to be delivered by an outgoing Governor within one year of the delivery of such correspondence and records. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Library of Virginia; disposition of official correspondence of the Governor, effective clause.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-24 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2019-02-24 | Senate | No further action taken |
2019-02-20 | House | Delegates: Gilbert, Peace, Hayes |
2019-02-20 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senators: Suetterlein, Sturtevant, Ebbin |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | House requested conference committee |
2019-02-18 | House | House insisted on amendment |
2019-02-15 | Senate | House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19104437D-E |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1703E |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19104437D |