VA SB163 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0062)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0062)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Entitlement to sales tax revenues from certain public facilities; authorized localities and facilities; sunset. Adds the City of Chesapeake to the list of localities that are authorized to issue bonds for the construction of public facilities and retain sales and use tax revenue generated within such facilities to pay off such bonds. The bill adds outdoor amphitheater to the list of authorized public facilities, provided that a locality owns, wholly or partly, and contributes to the construction of such amphitheater, and extends until July 1, 2024, the period of time during which authorized localities may issue bonds for the construction of public facilities and retain sales and use tax revenue generated within such facilities to pay off such bonds. Under current law, such authority expires on July 1, 2020.
Title
Entitlement to sales tax revenues from certain public facilities; authorized localities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 32-N) (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Finance (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Finance (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0062) | |
2020-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 62 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 2, 2020 | |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB163ER) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | House | VOTE: Passage (68-Y 32-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Passed House (68-Y 32-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from Finance (14-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Finance to Finance and Appropriations due to a change of the committee name |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101898D |
Same As/Similar To
HB906 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0329)