VA SB159 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0710)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0710)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Manufacturing, etc., Schedule I and II drugs. Adds a mandatory minimum term of confinement of three years for a second or subsequent conviction of manufacturing, selling, giving, distributing, or possessing with intent to distribute a Schedule I or II drug (now five to life) and increases the mandatory minimum term for a third or subsequent conviction from five years to 10 years.
Title
Drug trafficking; 3 years shall be mandatory minimum term of imprisonment for subsequent offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 13-N) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 19-N) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 13-N) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 19-N) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0710) | |
2012-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 710 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-17 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-15 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-15 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB159ER) | |
2012-03-15 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) | |
2012-03-10 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 13-N) | |
2012-03-10 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (84-Y 13-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Delegates: Bell, Robert B, Morris, Sickles | |
2012-03-08 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Senators: Obenshain, Garrett, Reeves | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-07 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2012-03-07 | House: House insisted on substitute | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 19-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute (77-Y 19-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB159H1 | |
2012-03-05 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105541D-H1 | |
2012-03-05 | House: Motion to reconsider the pass by for the day agreed to | |
2012-03-05 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-02 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-29 | House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety | |
2012-02-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-20 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105541D-H1 | |
2012-02-20 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2012-02-15 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-15 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-15 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB159S2 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105080D-S2 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute rejected 12104287D-S1 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105080D-S2 | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Substitute bill reprinted 12104287D-S1 | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104287D-S1 | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101835D |
Same As/Similar To
HB968 (Same As) 2012-05-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0844)