VA SB1574 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revenue sharing; gaming in the Commonwealth. Creates a revenue sharing program, if gaming is authorized in the Commonwealth, that would require the owner or operator of any gaming establishment to share a percentage of its adjusted gross receipts with the Commonwealth, ranging from 13 to 15 percent based on its annual adjusted gross receipts. The revenues would be distributed as follows: 30 percent to transportation initiatives, with one-third allocated to projects in the Interstate 81 corridor, one-third allocated to the Northern Virginia Transportation Authority Fund, and one-third allocated to the Hampton Roads Transportation Fund; 30 percent to school construction and modernization; 10 percent to support increases in teacher pay; 10 percent to support initiatives related to higher education affordability; 10 to the locality in which the revenues were collected; nine percent to support the marketing and promotion of tourism destinations, and one percent to used to prevent and treat gambling addictions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue sharing; gaming in the Commonwealth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseLeft in Appropriations
2019-02-08HouseAssigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1574S1
2019-02-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105363D-S1
2019-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-05SenateRead second time
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105363D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103196D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback