VA SB1533 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor's recommendation received by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor's recommendation received by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Medical marijuana program; additional cultivation facility. Allows a pharmaceutical processor that has obtained a permit to operate a pharmaceutical processing facility from the Board of Pharmacy to establish, if authorized by the Board, one additional location for the cultivation of cannabis plants, which must be located within the same health service area as the pharmaceutical processing facility. The bill requires the Board of Pharmacy to consider certain factors in determining whether to authorize an additional cultivation location. Medical marijuana program; additional cultivation facility. Allows a pharmaceutical processor that has obtained a permit to operate a pharmaceutical processing facility from the Board of Pharmacy to establish, if authorized by the Board, one additional location for the cultivation of cannabis plants, which must be located within the same health service area as the pharmaceutical processing facility. The bill requires the Board of Pharmacy to consider certain factors in determining whether to authorize an additional cultivation location.
Title
Medical marijuana program; additional cultivation facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (78-Y 18-N) (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (78-Y 18-N) (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1533ER) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-22 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (32-Y 8-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (78-Y 18-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | Passed House with amendments (78-Y 18-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2023-02-21 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-16 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23104080D-E |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1533E |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Deeds agreed to |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 6-N) |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 23104080D |