VA SB152 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Assistants to general registrars; full-time status. Clarifies that when determining the number of assistant registrars to serve in the office of the general registrar, the electoral board may include any to serve full-time. Currently, Russell County is required to have at least one full-time assistant registrar; counties and cities with populations exceeding 15,500 are required to have at least one part-time assistant registrar; and counties and cities with populations less than 15,500 are required to have at least one substitute registrar. The bill does not amend any of those mandates.
Title
General registrars; assistants, full-time status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465) | |
2018-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 465 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-16 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB152ER) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed House (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-05 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102927D |