VA SB1513 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0567)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0567)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Executive Council for Children's Services; membership. Adds the Commissioner of the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services to the State Executive Council for Children's Services. The bill also adds a representative from the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services to the state and local advisory team tasked with advising the Council, managing cooperative efforts at the state level, and supporting local community efforts. State Executive Council for Children's Services; membership. Adds the Commissioner of the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services to the State Executive Council for Children's Services. The bill also adds a representative from the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services to the state and local advisory team tasked with advising the Council, managing cooperative efforts at the state level, and supporting local community efforts.
Title
Children's Services, State Executive Council for; increases membership.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0567) | |
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 567 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1513ER) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-22 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2023-02-21 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-16 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2023-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23103891D-E |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1513E |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 23103891D |